Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Bernard Rooney, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of New Norcia

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1934 BornMelbourne
7 Mar 195924.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Mar 196429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Sep 197136.9AppointedSuperior of Kalumburu, Australia
19 Mar 197439.4SelectedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
31 Mar 197439.5ConfirmedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
198045.2ResignedSuperior of Kalumburu, Australia
15 Jun 198045.7ResignedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia

MicroData Summary for Bernard Rooney:
Abbot Bernard Rooney O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of New Norcia

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of New Norcia.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • prof/ab/k012: CB, 29 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015