Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward Heaps

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

Titular Bishop of Inis Cathaig


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1927Born
8 Mar 195831.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
4 Sep 198154.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
4 Sep 198154.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
31 Oct 198154.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
12 Mar 199265.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
21 Jun 200477.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Edward Heaps
Bishop John Edward Heaps (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamilton

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018