Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terence John Gerard Brady

Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney

Titular Bishop of Talaptula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1947 BornRose Bay
20 Aug 198336.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
4 Oct 200760.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
4 Oct 200760.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Talaptula
16 Nov 200760.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Talaptula
9 Jun 200962.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
30 Dec 201063.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Terence John Gerard Brady:
Bishop Terence John Gerard Brady (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Sydney.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013