Catholic-Hierarchy DC

George Cardinal Pell

Prefect of the Secretariat for the Economy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Domenica Mazzarello

Member of the Council of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1941 BornBallarat
16 Dec 196625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ballarat, Australia
30 Mar 198745.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
30 Mar 198745.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Scala
21 May 198746.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scala
16 Jul 199655.1AppointedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
26 Mar 200159.8AppointedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
21 Oct 200362.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200362.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Domenica Mazzarello
13 Apr 201371.8AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals
24 Feb 201472.7AppointedPrefect of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for George Pell:
George Cardinal Pell (born ) Prefect of Economy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Secretariat for the Economy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,413
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Sep 2014