Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis James Hart

Archbishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1941 Born
22 Jul 196726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
10 Nov 199756.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
10 Nov 199756.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagada
9 Dec 199756.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagada
22 Jun 200160.0AppointedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
1 Aug 200160.2InstalledArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
29 Jun 201877.1RetiredArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Denis James Hart
Archbishop Denis James Hart (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 459
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,177
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast