Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilton Forrest Deakin

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

Titular Bishop of Murthlacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1932 BornSeymour
27 Jul 195825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
30 Dec 199260.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
30 Dec 199260.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Murthlacum
3 Mar 199360.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murthlacum
13 Nov 200775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Hilton Forrest Deakin:
Bishop Hilton Forrest Deakin (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013