Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Peter O’Connell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

Titular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1931BornNorth Melbourne
28 Jul 195725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
24 Jan 197644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
24 Jan 197644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
31 Mar 197644.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
11 Dec 200675.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
27 Apr 201381.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Peter O’Connell:
Bishop Joseph Peter O’Connell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2006
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 10 Dec 2014