Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Francis Little

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Melbourne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1925BornWerribee
3 Oct 195024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
16 Nov 197247.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
16 Nov 197247.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Temuniana
21 Feb 197347.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temuniana
1 Jul 197448.6AppointedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
16 Jul 199670.6ResignedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
7 Apr 200882.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Little:
Archbishop Thomas Francis Little (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Melbourne

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 10 Dec 2014