Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Eric D’Arcy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hobart


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1924BornBrighton
24 Jul 194925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
25 Feb 198156.8AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
1 Jul 198157.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sale, Australia
24 Oct 198864.5AppointedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
26 Jul 199975.3RetiredArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
12 Dec 200581.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Eric D’Arcy:
Archbishop Joseph Eric D’Arcy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hobart

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 20 Nov 2014