Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hobart

Archidioecesis Hobartensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Julian Charles Porteous, Archbishop
  • Adrian Leo Doyle, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 August 1888
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 68,267 (26,368 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.hobart.catholic.org.au/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's Office, G.P.O. Box 62, Hobart, Tas. 7001, Australia
  • Telephone: (03)6208.6222
  • Fax: 6208.6293

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Hobart
5 April 1842ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land Vicariate Apostolic of Adelaide (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Hobart (erected)
Diocese of Hobart
22 April 1842ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hobart Diocese of Hobart
Archdiocese of Hobart
3 August 1888ElevatedDiocese of Hobart Archdiocese of Hobart

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Hobart
195038,50039,60097.2%5212646011227631ap1951
196663,987366,00017.5%70491195378434147ap1967
197071,089388,50018.3%71401116407742846ap1971
198071,290411,80017.3%6034947587026844ap1981
199082,954448,40018.5%4327701,1855720540ap1991
199989,156459,65919.4%4119601,4853915841ap2000
200089,156470,26119.0%3919581,5373615440ap2001
200189,156470,30019.0%3719561,5923615141ap2002
200289,156470,10019.0%3519541,65113113936ap2003
200387,691473,30018.5%3819571,5382513830ap2004
200487,691472,72518.6%3720571,5383012427ap2005
200687,691477,30518.4%3419531,6543111627ap2007
201388,834512,10017.3%3117481,8502257125ap2014
201688,903513,80017.3%3911501,7783195927ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast