Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Joseph Burgess

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wewak


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1938BornSingleton, Australia
23 Jul 196729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hobart, Australia
10 May 200061.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
27 Sep 200062.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
14 Aug 200264.0SucceededBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
20 Sep 201375.1RetiredBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
23 Oct 201375.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Wewak, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Anthony Joseph Burgess:
Bishop Anthony Joseph Burgess (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wewak

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,846
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2013
  • d: CB, 23 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013