Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Brian James Barnes, O.F.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Port Moresby


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1933 BornWingham, Australia
18 Feb 195218.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jul 195825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Oct 198754.5AppointedBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
10 Feb 198854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
14 Jun 199764.2AppointedArchbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
26 Mar 200875.0RetiredArchbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Brian James Barnes:
Archbishop Brian James Barnes O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Port Moresby

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Port Moresby.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014