Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Clement Andrew Arkfeld, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1912BornButte, NE, USA
15 Aug 194331.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Jul 194836.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central New Guinea
8 Jul 194836.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bucellus
30 Nov 194836.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bucellus
15 May 195240.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
15 Nov 196654.8AppointedBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
19 Dec 197563.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
19 Dec 197563.9AppointedArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
Aug 1987³75.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
31 Dec 198775.9RetiredArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
21 Aug 199987.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madang, Papua New Guinea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo Clement Andrew Arkfeld:
Archbishop Leo Clement Andrew Arkfeld S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madang

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 50.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013