Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Carmon, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Rusicade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1930Born
2 Feb 196029.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
16 Dec 199262.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
16 Dec 199262.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusicade
11 Feb 199362.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusicade
13 Dec 200676.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
11 Nov 201887.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Dominic Carmon
Bishop Dominic Carmon S.V.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOpelousas
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral Basilica, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Death PlaceNotre Dame, Château, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,002
  • d: CB, 11 Nov 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast