Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Etheridge, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1935Born
13 Jan 197135.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
24 Apr 198044.5AppointedBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
12 Aug 198044.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
7 Feb 198953.3ResignedBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
14 Aug 200266.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for John Etheridge
Bishop John Etheridge C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vanimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdelaide, Australia

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018