Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Höhne, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rabaul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1910BornHerben, Germany
14 Mar 193726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
1 Mar 196352.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
1 Mar 196352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Urima
11 May 196352.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urima
15 Nov 196656.2AppointedArchbishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
27 May 197867.7DiedArchbishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Johannes Höhne:
Archbishop Johannes Höhne M.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rabaul

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015