Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Verhoeven, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1896BornOisterwijk, Netherlands
15 Aug 192226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Mar 194750.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Manado, Indonesia
13 Mar 194750.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermonthis
15 May 194750.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermonthis
3 Jan 196164.5AppointedBishop of Manado, Indonesia
26 Jun 196973.0ResignedBishop of Manado, Indonesia
26 Jun 196973.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Strongoli
15 Sep 197680.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Strongoli
31 Mar 198184.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Manado, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Verhoeven:
Bishop Nicolas Verhoeven M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manado

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015