Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pieter Adriaan Willem Hopmans

Deceased

Bishop of Breda, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1865Born
12 Oct 189025.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 191449.0AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
1 Nov 191449.1Ordained BishopBishop of Breda, Netherlands
18 Feb 195185.4DiedBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Pieter Adriaan Willem Hopmans (VIAF: 288556576)
Bishop Pieter Adriaan Willem Hopmans (born , died ) Bishop of Breda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStanddaarbuiten

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,914, Number 58
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 91
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 360, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast