Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Joseph Paulissen, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kumasi

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1881BornMaastricht, Netherlands
12 Jun 190422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
29 Nov 193251.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kumasi, Ghana
29 Nov 193251.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
11 Feb 193351.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomaria
18 Apr 195068.4AppointedBishop of Kumasi, Ghana
15 Nov 195170.0ResignedBishop of Kumasi, Ghana
15 Nov 195170.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
12 Aug 196684.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Kumasi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Hubert Joseph Paulissen:
Bishop Hubert Joseph Paulissen S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kumasi

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015