Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andreas Franz Cardinal Frühwirth, O.P. †

Deceased

Chancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1845Born
13 Sep 186419.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jul 186822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Sep 189146.0AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
21 May 190458.7ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Oct 190762.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
26 Oct 190762.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
30 Nov 190762.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
6 Dec 191570.2Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 191570.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
7 Dec 191570.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Cosma e Damiano
8 Jan 192579.3AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
19 Dec 192782.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
19 Dec 192782.3AppointedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery
9 Feb 193387.4DiedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

MicroData Summary for Andreas Franz Frühwirth (VIAF: 30297912)
Andreas Franz Cardinal Frühwirth O.P. (born , died ) Chancellor of Apostolic Chancery

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSankt Anna am Aigen, Austria
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
  • a cardinal for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 68
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 58, and Page 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast