Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonino Zecchini, S.J. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Latvia

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1864BornVisco, Italy
25 Jun 189328.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
20 Oct 192257.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
25 Oct 192257.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Estonia
25 Oct 192257.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Latvia
25 Oct 192257.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Lithuania
21 Dec 192258.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
1 Nov 192459.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
7 Dec 192561.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Lithuania
14 Apr 192661.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Latvia
9 Nov 192863.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia
11 May 193166.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
22 Oct 193368.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Estonia
18 Mar 193570.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia

MicroData Summary for Antonino Zecchini:
Archbishop Antonino Zecchini S.J. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Latvia

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013