Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Joseph (Thomas) Esser, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sinis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1850BornAachen, Germany
7 Jun 187323.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 187928.8ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Jan 190049.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Index
22 Mar 191767.0ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of the Index
18 Jun 191767.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinis
8 Jul 191767.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinis
13 Mar 192675.9DiedTitular Bishop of Sinis

MicroData Summary for Hermann Joseph (Thomas) Esser:
Bishop Hermann Joseph (Thomas) Esser O.P. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sinis

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013