Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Sinibaldi

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1856BornCivitella San Paolo
15 May 191356.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
30 May 191356.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
16 Dec 191559.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
19 Aug 192871.8DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Sinibaldi:
Bishop Giacomo Sinibaldi (born , died ) Secretary of Seminaries and Universities

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1913, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015