Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

Congregatio de Institutione Catholica (de Studiorum Institutis)

United

To: Dicastery for Culture and Education



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
4 November 1915EstablishedCongregation of Seminaries and Universities
Congregation of Catholic Education
1967Name ChangedCongregation of Seminaries and Universities Congregation of Catholic Education
Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
28 June 1988Name ChangedCongregation of Catholic Education Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
5 June 2022UnitedPontifical Council for Culture
Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
Dicastery for Culture and Education

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 22 May 2023