Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Michael Miller, C.S.B.

Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1946 BornOttawa, Canada
12 Sep 196620.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of St. Basil
29 Jun 197529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of St. Basil
25 Nov 200357.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vertara
25 Nov 200357.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
12 Jan 200457.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vertara
1 Jun 200760.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
2 Jan 200962.5SucceededArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Michael Miller:
Archbishop John Michael Miller C.S.B. (born ) Archbishop of Vancouver

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vancouver.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,511

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014