Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald Peter Fabbro, C.S.B.

Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1950 Born
15 Aug 197524.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of St. Basil
3 May 198029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of St. Basil
1997²46.1AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of St. Basil
27 Apr 200251.4AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
15 Aug 200251.7Ordained BishopBishop of London, Ontario, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ronald Peter Fabbro
Bishop Ronald Peter Fabbro C.S.B. (born ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSudbury

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of London.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 11 Apr 2020

Quantcast