Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Thomas McNally

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1871BornHope River
4 Apr 189624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
4 Apr 191341.8AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
1 Jun 191341.9Ordained BishopBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
12 Aug 192453.1AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
26 Nov 192453.4InstalledBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
17 Feb 193765.6AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
18 Nov 195281.4DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Thomas McNally:
Archbishop John Thomas McNally (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 30
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013