Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Crest: from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Archdiocese of Halifax-Yarmouth

Archidioecesis Halifaxiensis-Yarmuthensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anthony Mancini, Archbishop
  • James Martin Hayes, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 22 October 2009
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Nova Scotia
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 21,770 (8,408 Square Miles)
  • Description: Queens, Lunenburg, Halifax, Hants, Cumberland, and Colchester Counties.
  • Conference Region: Atlantic (Atlantique)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Hal
  • Official Web Site (Halifax): http://www.catholichalifax.org/
  • Official Web Site (Yarmouth): http://www.dioceseyarmouth.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 1527, 1531 Grafton St., Halifax, N.S. B3J 2Y3, Canada
  • Telephone: (902)429-9800
  • Fax: 423-5201

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nova Scotia
4 July 1817ErectedDiocese of Québec Vicariate Apostolic of Nova Scotia (erected)
Diocese of Halifax
15 February 1842ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nova Scotia Diocese of Halifax (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
22 September 1844Territory LostDiocese of Halifax Diocese of Arichat (erected)
Archdiocese of Halifax
4 May 1852ElevatedDiocese of Halifax Archdiocese of Halifax
6 July 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Halifax Diocese of Yarmouth (erected)
Archdiocese of Halifax-Yarmouth
22 October 2009UnitedArchdiocese of Halifax
Diocese of Yarmouth
Archdiocese of Halifax-Yarmouth

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Halifax
195083,500462,00018.1%97521495602686562ap1951
196688,000375,00023.5%86401266984580049ap1967
1968120,000450,00026.7%90451358884758050ap1971
1976112,040414,66327.0%75251001,12032644047ap1977
1980107,800401,00026.9%73291021,05663244051ap1981
1990140,640496,80028.3%7226981,435232738253ap1991
1999155,000658,17023.6%6421851,823262230453ap2000
2000155,000634,10024.4%6420841,845262129253ap2001
2001155,000517,83329.9%6321841,845252328753ap2002
2002155,000517,83329.9%6922911,703252429054ap2003
2003155,000540,92228.7%5825831,867242720954ap2004
2004155,000540,82128.7%6023831,867242526452ap2005
2006161,125564,58328.5%6416802,014281724353ap2007
Archdiocese of Halifax-Yarmouth
2010207,900733,30028.4%7619952,188342021471ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013