Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Cameron

Deceased

Bishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1827Born
26 Jul 185326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
11 Mar 187042.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
11 Mar 187042.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
22 May 187043.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
17 Jul 187750.2SucceededBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
23 Aug 188659.3AppointedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
7 Apr 191082.9DiedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Cameron (VIAF: 37722436)
Bishop John Cameron (born , died ) Bishop of Antigonish

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Andrew, Vicariate Apostolic of Nova Scotia
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCollege of the Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAntigonish, Diocese of Antigonish, Nova Scotia
Buried Place (Original)St. Ninian, Cemetery, Antigonish, Diocese of Antigonish, Nova Scotia

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 556
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 20
  • c1/loc: CB, 10 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast