Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Trionfetti, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1803Born
4 Nov 182017.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
7 May 182622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1856²52.2AppointedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 Sep 186258.9AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
5 Oct 186258.9Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
23 Feb 188076.3ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
27 Feb 188076.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
9 Jan 188480.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Trionfetti
Bishop Bernardino Trionfetti O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Franco
Ordained BishopSt Barthelemy, Convent, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 179, and Page 541
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Oct 2017