Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Filippi, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1810Born
22 Feb 183424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 185343.0SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
7 Mar 185343.1AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
13 Mar 185343.1Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
19 Jan 187665.9AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
28 Jan 188171.0DiedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Filippi (VIAF: 71381255)
Archbishop Luigi Filippi O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Archbishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvigliano
Ordained BishopS. Francois ad Ripam, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017