Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Capecelatro di Castelpagano, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1824BornMarseille, France
1 Apr 184016.2ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
23 May 184723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 Aug 188056.5AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
28 Oct 188056.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
27 Jul 188561.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jul 188561.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
15 Jan 188661.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
29 Apr 189066.2AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
14 Nov 191288.8DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Capecelatro di Castelpagano:
Cardinal Alfonso Capecelatro di Castelpagano C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
  • a cardinal for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 180, and Page 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013