Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Biagio Pisani

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus

Auxiliary Bishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1850Born
30 May 187424.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189545.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
29 Nov 189545.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
8 Dec 189545.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
23 Apr 189747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
25 Jun 190151.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
28 Jan 191868.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus

MicroData Summary for Biagio Pisani (VIAF: 256113423)
Archbishop Biagio Pisani (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Naupactus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerra San Bruno, Diocese of Squillace, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Capua, Archdiocese of Capua, Italy

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 167, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017