Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Cosenza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1852Born
12 Jul 187422.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189038.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
23 Jun 189038.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
13 Jul 189038.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
12 Jun 189341.2AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
4 Mar 191360.9AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
2 Jan 193077.8RetiredArchbishop of Capua, Italy
2 Jan 193077.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
20 Mar 193078.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Cosenza
Archbishop Gennaro Cosenza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt Gregoire d'Armenie, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 188, and Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017