Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele de Martinis, C.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1828Born
28 Apr 189667.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
5 Jul 189668.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
15 Feb 190071.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

MicroData Summary for Raffaele de Martinis (VIAF: 31571142)
Archbishop Raffaele de Martinis C.M. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopVergine-Lazaristes, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017