Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Angiulli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Augusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1849Born
24 Sep 187223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 May 189445.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 May 189445.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Augusta
3 Jun 189445.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augusta
11 May 191869.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Angiulli
Bishop Ernesto Angiulli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017