Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Michele Zezza di Zapponeta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1850BornNapoli
21 Sep 187222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1 Jun 189141.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1 Jun 189141.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
21 Jun 189141.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
12 Jun 189343.2AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
3 Jul 191969.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
3 Jul 191969.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
4 Apr 192373.0SucceededArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
3 Jun 192373.2InstalledArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 Dec 192373.7RetiredArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 Dec 192373.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
26 Jun 192777.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Zezza di Zapponeta:
Patriarch Michele Zezza di Zapponeta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 174, and Page 473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013