Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Degni di Salento

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1839BornNapoli
11 Jun 187031.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 188647.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 Jun 188647.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
15 Jun 188647.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
1913¹73.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Degni di Salento:
Bishop Filippo Degni di Salento (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013