Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Picone

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1836Born
17 Dec 185923.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189558.6AppointedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
25 Mar 189558.6Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
5 Sep 191781.1DiedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Picone (VIAF: 90261363)
Bishop Pasquale Picone (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasaluce, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained BishopAversa, Diocese of Aversa

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 379
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,751
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017