Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Schir˛

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1866BornPiana dei Greci, Italy
5 Feb 190438.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
20 Mar 190438.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
12 Sep 194175.7DiedTitular Bishop of Benda

MicroData Summary for Paolo Schir˛:
Bishop Paolo Schir˛ (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Benda

  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1938
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1904, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013