Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Lamberti

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1859Born
8 Oct 188223.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189737.9AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
16 May 189738.0Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
12 Aug 191758.2DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lamberti (VIAF: 89161034)
Bishop Antonio Lamberti (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bari, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,229
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1897, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017