Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso de Stefano (Stefani)

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1853Born
24 Sep 187623.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189339.5AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
19 Jan 189339.5AppointedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
29 Jan 189339.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
24 Mar 189844.7AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
19 May 190652.8DiedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Tommaso de Stefano (Stefani)
Archbishop Tommaso de Stefano (Stefani) (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteforte Irpino
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Aquiro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 487, and Page 561
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,893, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast