Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Canestrari

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1843Born
23 Sep 186522.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 188642.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
15 Jan 188642.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
24 Jan 188642.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
11 Sep 190158.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Canestrari
Bishop Luigi Maria Canestrari (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotella, Diocese of Montalto (delle Marche)
Ordained BishopVII douleurs, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 548
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017