Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Gargiulo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1843BornMaiano
17 Mar 186623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Mar 189552.0AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
24 Mar 189552.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
9 May 190461.1DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Gargiulo:
Bishop Bonaventura Gargiulo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 515

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013