Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1825Born
18 Mar 184822.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187449.6AppointedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
3 Jan 187549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
24 Jan 188256.7AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
14 Oct 190681.4DiedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Rossi (VIAF: 89461025)
Bishop Angelo Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefiascone, Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone
Ordained BishopS. Antoine des Portugais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 227, and Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Mar 2017