Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1851Born
19 Dec 187423.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189543.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bova, Italy
18 Mar 189543.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
24 Mar 189543.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
8 Jul 189544.1SucceededBishop of Bova, Italy
14 Dec 189948.5AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
18 Aug 190655.2DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Rossi (VIAF: 90088258)
Archbishop Raffaele Rossi (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria Ingrisone, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopTor dei Spechi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jun 2017