Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia

Dioecesis Centumcellarum-Tarquiniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luigi Marrucci, Bishop
  • Girolamo Grillo, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Civitavecchia
20 December 1825ErectedDiocese of Civitavecchia (erected)
14 June 1854UnitedDiocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone
Diocese of Civitavecchia
Diocese of Montefiascone
Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia
Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia
14 June 1854UnitedDiocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone
Diocese of Civitavecchia
Diocese of Montefiascone
Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia
Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia
194966,94966,949100.0%221232,9103020612ap1951
196976,09877,00898.8%4135761,0013928023ap1971
198078,00078,70099.1%3641771,0124623528ap1981
Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia
199085,00088,00096.6%3527621,37042818725ap1991
1999136,000151,10090.0%4929781,74353519025ap2000
2000136,000151,10090.0%4630761,78963517025ap2001
2001130,000140,00092.9%4422661,96972616725ap2002
200282,00085,00096.5%4426701,17173117026ap2003
200382,00085,00096.5%4928771,064104015826ap2004
200482,00085,00096.5%4820681,205102216326ap2005
200682,75285,74696.5%4721681,21692315726ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013