Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Franceschi

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1924Born
21 Dec 194622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
30 May 197349.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
30 May 197349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
29 Jun 197349.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Silli
15 Jul 197652.1AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
15 Jul 197652.1AppointedBishop of Comacchio (-Pomposa), Italy
12 Sep 197652.3InstalledArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
7 Jan 198257.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Padova {Padua}, Italy
30 Dec 198864.6DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Franceschi
Archbishop Filippo Franceschi (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagni di Lucca
Ordained PriestLucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Mar 2017