Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Libanori, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Buruni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1953 Born
11 Jun 197724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ferrara, Italy
26 Dec 199138.5EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Oct 200249.3Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Nov 201764.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Nov 201764.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Buruni
13 Jan 201864.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buruni

MicroData Summary for Daniele Libanori
Bishop Daniele Libanori S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstellato, Archdiocese of Ferrara
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2017
  • bd/ob: CB, 23 Nov 2017
  • c34: CB, 9 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast