Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján

Archidioecesis Mercedensis-Luianensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 November 1997
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 19,330 (7,466 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle 22 No 745, 6600 Mercedes [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (02324) 432-412
  • Fax: 432-104

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Mercedes
20 April 1934ErectedDiocese of La Plata Diocese of Mercedes (erected)
3 March 1947Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Mercedes
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostDiocese of Azul
Diocese of Mercedes
Diocese of Nueve de Julio (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostDiocese of Bahía Blanca
Diocese of Mercedes
Diocese of Santa Rosa (erected)
Diocese of Mercedes-Luján
10 May 1989Name ChangedDiocese of Mercedes Diocese of Mercedes-Luján
Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján
21 November 1997ElevatedDiocese of Mercedes-Luján Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mercedes
1950950,0001,100,00086.4%75651406,78514641559ap1951
1964390,000420,00092.9%75401153,3915927428ap1967
1970420,000450,00093.3%67351024,1175820231ap1971
1976410,000420,00097.6%68341024,0196422834ap1977
1980421,000450,00093.6%5533884,7848018034ap1981
Diocese of Mercedes-Luján
1990470,000480,00097.9%6031915,16416621538ap1991
1996551,000496,000111.1%955,800vis971124
Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján
1999529,000540,00098.0%77321094,85316716044ap2000
2000539,000550,00098.0%74321065,08416718644ap2001
2001671,300685,00098.0%85321175,73716718646ap2002
2002677,300691,00098.0%80321126,04717118646ap2003
2003688,700710,00097.0%7719967,17315818254ap2004
2004689,300712,00096.8%88131016,82414018248ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 4 Nov 2012